Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Szemiot

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1709³Born
10 Jan 173424.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
10 Apr 173424.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 176051.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
24 Sep 176253.3DiedTitular Bishop of Loryma

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jan Szemiot
Bishop Jan Szemiot (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Loryma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalvarien Vercovien

  • a priest for 28.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 265, and Page 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast