Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Janusz Suchywilk

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1310¹Born
16 Apr 137464.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
28 Apr 137464.3AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
5 Apr 138272.2DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Janusz Suchywilk
Archbishop Janusz Suchywilk (born 1310, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrzelce
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Death PlaceZnin

  • a bishop for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,399
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast