Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stigand

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1043¹AppointedBishop of Elmham, England, Great Britain
3 Apr 1043Ordained BishopBishop of Elmham, England, Great Britain
1047²AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
1052²AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
11 Apr 1070ResignedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
22 Feb 1072DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stigand
Archbishop Stigand (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Canterbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWinchester, Diocese of Winchester, England

  • a bishop for 28.8 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jun 2017