Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geoffroy de Saint Géran

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1422¹Born
7 Jan 145028.0AppointedBishop of Nîmes, France
27 Nov 145331.9AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
10 Feb 150381.1DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Geoffroy de Saint Géran
Bishop Geoffroy de Saint Géran (born 1422, died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 122, and Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast