Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludwik Stempkowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1610Born
21 Nov 162111.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
26 Sep 163827.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
20 Mar 165140.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
30 Mar 165140.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
2 Jun 165342.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
1658¹47.2SucceededBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
3 May 166453.5DiedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludwik Stempkowski:
Bishop Ludwik Stempkowski (born , died ) Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,182
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 130, and Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013