Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej ze Starej Łomży

Deceased

Bishop of Chełm, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450¹Born
19 Mar 148434.2AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
14 Mar 149040.2AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
12 Sep 150555.6DiedBishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Maciej ze Starej Łomży
Bishop Maciej ze Starej Łomży (born 1450, died ) Bishop of Chełm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStarej Łomży

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 165, and Page 126
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 22*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Dec 2018

Quantcast