Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnold Stapel (Stapil), O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1360Born
17 Mar 140242.2SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
26 Jul 140242.6ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
22 Oct 140242.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
31 May 141656.4DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Arnold Stapel (Stapil):
Bishop Arnold Stapel (Stapil) O.T. (died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 217
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,622
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014