Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Supersaxo

Deceased

Bishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1402¹Born
24 Dec 145755.9SelectedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
28 Feb 145856.1ConfirmedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
4 Mar 145957.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
7 Jul 148280.5DiedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Walter Supersaxo (VIAF: 309611024)
Bishop Walter Supersaxo (born 1402, died ) Bishop of Sion {Sitten}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Novara, Diocese of Novara, Italy

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 11 Dec 2012
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 233
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1459, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Aug 2018

Quantcast