Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Francesco Spolverini

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1838Born
25 Apr 188244.2AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
20 Jul 188749.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
1892¹53.9ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
13 Oct 191880.7DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Spolverini
Father Francesco Spolverini (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Brazil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martino al Cimino, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 79, and Page 185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast