Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giambattista Cardinal Spínola (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1646BornGenoa, Italy
12 Dec 169549.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jan 169649.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
24 Nov 169852.3AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
25 Jan 170659.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
19 Mar 171972.6DiedCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Spínola (Jr.):
Cardinal Giambattista Spínola (Jr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio

  • a cardinal for 23.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013