Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Sperelli

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Mar 1605AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
5 Mar 1605AppointedTitular Bishop of Claudiopolis in Honoriade
3 Jul 1607SucceededBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
22 Jul 1631DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Sperelli:
Bishop Ascanio Sperelli (died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 314, and Page 153
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 6 Feb 2015