Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Amedeo da Gangi Marcantonio Speciale, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Crete {Candia}, Greece

Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1887Born
13 Jun 190417.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 Jun 190720.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Aug 190821.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1945²57.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Crete {Candia}, Greece
1951²63.9CeasedApostolic Administrator of Crete {Candia}, Greece
4 Apr 196881.1DiedPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Amedeo da Gangi Marcantonio Speciale
Father Amedeo da Gangi Marcantonio Speciale O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Crete {Candia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGangi
Death PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy

  • a priest for 59.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 3 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 5 Sep 2018

Quantcast