Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Spada

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1787Born
23 Jun 183447.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
6 Apr 183548.0Elevated to Cardinal
6 Apr 183548.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
16 Dec 184356.6DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Spada
Alessandro Cardinal Spada (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.4 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast