Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Barthélemy Sostion

Deceased

Abbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Dec 1520SelectedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
24 Jul 1548ConfirmedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland
10 May 1550DiedAbbot of Saint-Maurice, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Barthélemy Sostion
Abbot Barthélemy Sostion (died ) Abbot of Saint-Maurice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Maurice

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books, 2,015, 11, 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast