Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Soggiu, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Prefect of Ankang [Hinganfu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1883Born
190824.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
28 Jul 191229.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1 Aug 192845.3AppointedPrefect of Ankang [Hinganfu], China
12 Nov 193047.6DiedPrefect of Ankang [Hinganfu], China

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Soggiu
Father Giovanni Soggiu O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Prefect of Ankang [Hinganfu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorbello, Italy

  • a priest for 18.2 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast