Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuliano Soderini

Deceased

Bishop of Saintes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 May 1509AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
12 Jun 1514AppointedBishop of Saintes, France
30 Jul 1544DiedBishop of Saintes, France

MicroData Summary for Giuliano Soderini
Bishop Giuliano Soderini (died ) Bishop of Saintes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 337, and Page 338
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1514, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast