Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sante

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bova

Titular Bishop of Samaria

Note/Previous Titular See: (from bish/Orense?)


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Apr 1420AppointedBishop of Orte, Italy
19 Mar 1431AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
14 Jan 1433AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
1434¹ResignedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
23 Sep 1435AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
22 Sep 1441ResignedBishop of Bova, Italy
22 Sep 1441AppointedTitular Bishop of Samaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sante :
Bishop Sante Bishop Emeritus of Bova

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 279
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 232, and Page 129
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 109, and Page 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013