Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Smith

Deceased

Bishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1476AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
21 Jul 1476Ordained BishopBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
29 Jan 1478DiedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Smith
Bishop John Smith (died ) Bishop of Llandaff

  • a bishop for 1.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 171
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 249
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 92
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1476, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 23 Nov 2018

Quantcast