Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Henricus Leo Smeets, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Benkoelen, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1887Born
28 May 192437.2AppointedPrefect of Benkoelen, Indonesia
192638.8ResignedPrefect of Benkoelen, Indonesia
26 Jul 195265.4DiedPrefect Emeritus of Benkoelen, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Henricus Leo Smeets
Father Henricus Leo Smeets S.C.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Benkoelen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWeert, Netherlands
Death PlaceHeerlen, Netherlands

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 21 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 22 Dec 2018

Quantcast