Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sisinnio

Deceased

Bishop of Bisarcio, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1442AppointedBishop of Sulcis, Italy
5 Jul 1443AppointedBishop of Ampurias, Italy
23 Oct 1448AppointedBishop of Bisarcio, Italy
1466²DiedBishop of Bisarcio, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sisinnio
Bishop Sisinnio (died 1466) Bishop of Bisarcio

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 243, and Page 86
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Aug 2019

Quantcast