Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ludovico Cardinal Simonetta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pesaro, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
19 Dec 153737.9AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
26 Feb 156161.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 156161.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
9 May 156161.3ResignedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
8 Jun 156363.4AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
15 Nov 156666.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
30 Apr 156868.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Pesaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Simonetta (VIAF: 38078957)
Ludovico Cardinal Simonetta (born 1500, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria degli Angeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 274
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 36*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast