Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Silvestri

Deceased

Bishop of Pienza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1647Born
1 Apr 167931.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 170658.4AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
13 Jun 171466.4AppointedBishop of Pienza, Italy
Nov 1724³76.8DiedBishop of Pienza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Silvestri
Bishop Ascanio Silvestri (born , died Nov 1724) Bishop of Pienza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena

  • a priest for 45.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1722
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 260, and Page 314
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast