Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Gennaro Sibilia

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1657³Born
27 Dec 168124.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Dec 168124.2Ordained PriestPriest
170143.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
170446.2ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
19 May 170446.6AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
21 Sep 170951.9DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Gennaro Sibilia
Bishop Matteo Gennaro Sibilia (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 27.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 255
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast