Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father James Jerome Sharrock, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1750BornWalton le Dale, Preston, Lancashire
1768²17.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1774¹23.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Jun 180656.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western District, England, Great Britain
27 Jun 180656.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
1 Apr 180858.1Died

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for James Jerome Sharrock
Father James Jerome Sharrock O.S.B. (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect

  • a priest for 34.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 365
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1806
  • b: CB, 16 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 17 Feb 2016