Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ottaviano Maria Sforza

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1475BornMilan
27 Oct 149722.8AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
149924.0ResignedBishop of Lodi, Italy
151237.0AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
19 Nov 151944.9AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
152550.0ResignedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
20 May 154166.4AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
20 May 154166.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
154570.0DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano Maria Sforza:
Patriarch Ottaviano Maria Sforza Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 116, and Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013