Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Gabriele Sforza, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1423Born
20 Jun 145431.0AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
28 Jul 145431.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 Sep 145734.2DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Gabriele Sforza:
Archbishop Carlo Gabriele Sforza O.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 188
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013