Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anian Seys

Deceased

Bishop of Bangor, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Aug 1309AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
9 Nov 1309Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
26 Jan 1328DiedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Anian Seys:
Bishop Anian Seys (died ) Bishop of Bangor

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 127
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 70
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013