Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Giovanni Battista Maoletti, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China

Titular Bishop of Magydus

Titular See: (died before consecration)


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Aug 1759AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China
22 Aug 1759AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
1 Jul 1761DiedVicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi, China

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Maoletti
Father Giovanni Battista Maoletti O.F.M. Ref. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Chansi and Chensi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerravalle, Diocese of Vercelli, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 272, and Page 455
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast