Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Sennyey

Deceased

Bishop of Veszprém, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627¹Born
18 Feb 166841.1SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
14 Jan 166942.0ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
10 Apr 168760.2DiedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for István Sennyey
Bishop István Sennyey (born 1627, died ) Bishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTárkány

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 413
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast