Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesc Senjust, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Aug 1621AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
12 Dec 1621Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
24 Aug 1622AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
10 Mar 1627DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francesc Senjust:
Bishop Francesc Senjust O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Gerona

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 182, and Page 194
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 141, Number 896
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 44
  • c34: CB, 9 Apr 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 26 Aug 2015