Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso Suárez de la Fuente del Sauce

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1493AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
4 Dec 1495AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
7 Feb 1500AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
5 Nov 1520DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alonso Suárez de la Fuente del Sauce
Bishop Alonso Suárez de la Fuente del Sauce (died ) Bishop of Jaén

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 181, and Page 193
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 159
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1493, Number 19*
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast