Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Venanzio Felice Scotti

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1726³BornCastelnuovo
31 May 174922.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 178458.2AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
13 Dec 179569.5DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Venanzio Felice Scotti:
Bishop Venanzio Felice Scotti (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

  • a priest for 46.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 379
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016