Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Felipe Scío (de San Miguel), Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1738Born
1762¹23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
18 Dec 179557.2AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
9 Apr 179657.5DiedBishop-Elect of Segovia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Scío (de San Miguel)
Father Felipe Scío (de San Miguel) Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValsaín

  • a priest for 34.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast