Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Johannes Schütte, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Society of the Divine Word


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1913Born
193420.6ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
24 Aug 193926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
194834.6AppointedPro-Prefect of Xinxiang [Sinsiang], China
28 Mar 195844.9AppointedSuperior General of Society of the Divine Word
15 Dec 196754.6ResignedSuperior General of Society of the Divine Word
18 Nov 197158.5DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Society of the Divine Word

MicroData Summary for Johannes Schütte
Father Johannes Schütte S.V.D. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Society of the Divine Word

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEssen, Germany

  • a priest for 32.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast