Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph von der Schulenburg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ratzeburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
22 May 1551AppointedBishop of Ratzeburg, Germany
5 Oct 1554ResignedBishop of Ratzeburg, Germany
9 Sep 1580DiedBishop Emeritus of Ratzeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Christoph von der Schulenburg (VIAF: 184180130)
Bishop Christoph von der Schulenburg (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ratzeburg

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 282
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1551

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast