Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vinzenz von Schleinitz

Deceased

Bishop of Merseburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Apr 1526SelectedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
13 Jun 1526ConfirmedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
21 Oct 1526Ordained BishopBishop of Merseburg, Germany
21 Mar 1535DiedBishop of Merseburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Vinzenz von Schleinitz (VIAF: 101279945)
Bishop Vinzenz von Schleinitz (died ) Bishop of Merseburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNaumburg
Death PlaceMerseburg, Diocese of Merseburg

  • a bishop for 8.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,540
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1526, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jun 2018

Quantcast