Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Friedrich von Schleswig-Holstein

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1529Born
3 Oct 155122.7SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
6 Jul 155425.5ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
27 Sep 155627.7DiedBishop-Elect of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Schleswig-Holstein
Father Friedrich von Schleswig-Holstein (born 1529, died ) Bishop-Elect of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCopenhagen

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast