Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Schives de Vulfalt

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Sep 1476AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
11 Feb 1478SucceededArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Jan 1497DiedArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Schives de Vulfalt
Archbishop William Schives de Vulfalt (died ) Archbishop of Saint Andrews

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 88
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1476, Number 34*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast