Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Theodos (Peter) Schall, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Eshowe

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1884BornNandlstadt, Germany
8 Oct 190521.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
30 May 190925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 May 194358.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Eshowe, South Africa
3 Aug 194763.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Eshowe, South Africa
16 Nov 195571.4DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Eshowe, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Theodos (Peter) Schall:
Priest Theodos (Peter) Schall O.S.B. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Eshowe

  • a priest for 46.5 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013