Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Schadland, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1311¹BornKöln
16 Dec 135948.9AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
22 Mar 136352.2AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
20 Aug 136554.6AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
16 Jun 137160.4AppointedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
1373¹62.0ResignedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
1 Apr 137362.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Schadland: VIAF:27495529
Bishop Johann Schadland O.P. (born 1311, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 217, and Page 277
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 534, and Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 24 Jan 2016