Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Scarola

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1737³Born
16 May 176124.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 180164.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
20 Jul 180164.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
14 Feb 180366.1DiedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Filippo Scarola
Bishop Filippo Scarola (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Ordained BishopRoyal Palace, Chapel, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceCaserta, Diocese of Caserta, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Sebastiano, Castel Nuovo, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 211
  • d: AT, 12 Jun 2018
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,729

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast