Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bandinello Cardinal Sauli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gerace

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1494BornGenoa
5 Oct 150612.8AppointedBishop of Malta
1509²15.0AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
10 Mar 151117.2Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 151117.2InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
24 Oct 151117.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Sabina
5 Aug 151319.6AppointedAdministrator of Albenga, Italy
18 Jul 151622.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Trastevere
19 Nov 151723.9ResignedBishop of Gerace, Italy
19 Nov 151723.9ResignedAdministrator of Albenga, Italy
29 Mar 151824.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Gerace, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bandinello Sauli:
Cardinal Bandinello Sauli (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gerace

  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1511
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 209, and Page 101
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 243

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 1 Dec 2013