Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Ignace IV Sarrouf, B.C. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1742²Born
15 Aug 175816.6Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
1764²22.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
1773²31.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
1778¹36.0AppointedArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
8 Jul 177836.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
21 Feb 181270.1AppointedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
21 Feb 181270.1AppointedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
18 Nov 181270.8DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignace IV Sarrouf
Patriarch Ignace IV Sarrouf B.C. (born 1742, died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDamascus

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 79
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,138
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018