Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Pál Endre Sárközy, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1884Born
29 Jun 190924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Feb 195166.1AppointedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary
10 May 195772.4DiedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Pál Endre Sárközy
Abbot Pál Endre Sárközy O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Pannonhalma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJanoshaza

  • a priest for 47.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1955

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast