Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jerome de São Tiago, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Cranganore (Angamala), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645¹Born
7 Sep 168540.6SelectedBishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
2 Sep 168843.6ResignedBishop-Elect of Cranganore (Angamala), India
8 Jan 168944.0ConfirmedBishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
15 Aug 172075.6DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerome de São Tiago
Father Jerome de São Tiago O.S.B. (born 1645, died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Cranganore (Angamala)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast