Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Rufino Santos Pérez, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of San León del Amazonas, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1859Born
8 Sep 187920.1ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
20 Dec 188425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
12 Feb 191454.5AppointedPrefect of San León del Amazonas, Peru
15 Sep 191556.1ResignedPrefect of San León del Amazonas, Peru
29 Nov 193576.3DiedPrefect Emeritus of San León del Amazonas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Rufino Santos Pérez
Father Rufino Santos Pérez O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of San León del Amazonas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrión de los Condes, Spain

  • a priest for 50.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 15 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast