Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Sanna

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1674³Born
21 Sep 169723.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Mar 169824.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 172854.3SelectedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
14 Jun 172854.4ConfirmedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
Jan 1736³61.9DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Sanna
Bishop Giovanni Battista Sanna (born , died Jan 1736) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSassari

  • a priest for 37.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,733
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 401
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,728, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast