Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio de Sanctis, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554²Born
31 Jul 160652.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Salamis
24 Oct 161157.8AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
2 Oct 161258.7DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio de Sanctis
Bishop Gregorio de Sanctis C.R. (born 1554, died ) Bishop of Belcastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 301, and Page 111
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast