Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sampson

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
1096¹AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
7 Jun 1096Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 1096Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
5 May 1112DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sampson :
Bishop Sampson (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a priest for 15.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 41
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014