Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Salvini, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jan 1455AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
16 Mar 1455Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
15 May 1477DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Salvini
Bishop Mariano Salvini O.S.M. (died ) Bishop of Cortona

  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,410
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast